Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Melchior Otto von Voit von Salzburg

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1603Born
24 Aug 164239.1SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 May 164339.8ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
4 Jan 165349.5DiedBishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Melchior Otto von Voit von Salzburg
Father Melchior Otto von Voit von Salzburg (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEichenhausen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 109
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,643, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast