Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Vogelsang von Heisberg

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1401AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
24 Jul 1401Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
24 Jul 1415DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Vogelsang von Heisberg:
Bishop Heinrich Vogelsang von Heisberg (died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a bishop for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 516
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013