Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lazzaro Vladagni

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Apostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1705¹Born
9 Mar 174641.1AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
21 Jul 174944.5AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
7 Sep 175045.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
4 Feb 178681.0DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lazzaro Vladagni
Archbishop Lazzaro Vladagni (born 1705, died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrë

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86, and Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 367
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,746, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast