Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Vizzardelli

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1791Born
30 Jan 184351.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
24 Jul 184756.0ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
17 Jan 184856.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jan 184856.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
10 Apr 184856.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
24 May 185159.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

MicroData Summary for Carlo Vizzardelli (VIAF: 89732629)
Carlo Cardinal Vizzardelli (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte San Giovanni Campano, Diocese of Veroli, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Pancrazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 21
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jan 1848

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 10 Mar 2018