Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Viviani

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1556AppointedBishop of Sitia, Greece
16 Jul 1571AppointedBishop of Hierapetra et Sitia, Greece
3 Aug 1579AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
25 Jan 1605DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Viviani
Bishop Gaspare Viviani (died ) Bishop of Anagni

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 107, and Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast