Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Matthäus Joseph Ignaz Vitzki

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1660BornWittichenau
21 Sep 168525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
2 Dec 170040.2AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
23 Jun 171352.8DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Joseph Ignaz Vitzki:
Priest Matthäus Joseph Ignaz Vitzki (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 27.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013