Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Pietro Vittorelli, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of Montecassino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1962 BornRoma
13 Jan 199128.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jun 199432.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Oct 200745.3SelectedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
17 Nov 200745.4ConfirmedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
28 Dec 200745.5InstalledAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
12 Jun 201351.0ResignedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Vittorelli:
Abbot Pietro Vittorelli O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Montecassino

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Montecassino.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 25 Oct 2014