Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Vittori

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1571AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
2 Jun 1572AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
29 Jun 1572DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Vittori
Bishop Mariano Vittori (died ) Bishop of Rieti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283, and Page 106
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018