Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe de Vitry

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1291Born
3 Jan 135159.1AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
9 Jun 136169.6DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Vitry (VIAF: 10035697)
Bishop Philippe de Vitry (born , died ) Bishop of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceMeaux, Diocese of Meaux
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Etienne de Meaux, Cathedral, Meaux, Diocese of Meaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast