Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Vitale Bovio (de’ Buoi)

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹Born
4 May 158038.3AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
31 Jul 158038.5Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
27 Oct 158442.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
15 Nov 158644.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
26 Jan 159654.0DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Vitale Bovio (de’ Buoi)
Bishop Gerolamo Vitale Bovio (de’ Buoi) (born 1542, died ) Bishop of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopS. Gregoire chapel, St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 11
  • b: Treccani.it, 13 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018