Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luca Antonio Cardinal Virili

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569BornRome, Italy
19 Nov 162960.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 162961.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
4 Jun 163465.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

MicroData Summary for Luca Antonio Virili:
Cardinal Luca Antonio Virili (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

  • a cardinal for 4.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013