Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Vincenzi

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Aug 1472AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
29 May 1475AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
10 Dec 1479DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Vincenzi
Bishop Tommaso Vincenzi (died ) Bishop of Pesaro

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 168, and Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,472, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast