Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Vieira Leitão

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1648³BornLisboa
24 Sep 167931.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Sep 167931.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 169345.5AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
16 Aug 169446.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
22 May 171465.9DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Vieira Leitão:
Bishop António Vieira Leitão (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015