Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim do Rosário Vieira, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Beja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1746BornOurem
27 Dec 177024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 May 180760.6SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
3 Aug 180760.9ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
8 Sep 180862.0DiedBishop of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim do Rosário Vieira:
Bishop Joaquim do Rosário Vieira O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Beja

  • a priest for 37.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013