Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gregório José Viegas, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1753³BornLisboa
2 Feb 177319.8ProfessedMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
8 Jun 182067.2SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
8 Jan 182167.8ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
1822¹68.8ResignedBishop-Elect of Olinda, Brazil
7 Jul 184087.3DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Olinda, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregório José Viegas
Father Gregório José Viegas T.O.R. (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Olinda

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 290
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016