Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Viedma Chaves, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1623AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Mar 1623AppointedTitular Bishop of Petra in Palaestina
29 Apr 1623Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petra in Palaestina
18 Mar 1630AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Almería, Spain
8 Mar 1631SucceededBishop of Almería, Spain
9 Jun 1631DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Viedma Chaves
Bishop Antonio Viedma Chaves O.P. (died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 79, and Page 278
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,400
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 144, Number 915
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,623, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast