Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Giovanni Vico Torrellas

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1704³BornCagliari
25 Jan 173328.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Feb 173328.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 173733.0AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
29 Mar 174136.5SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
3 Jul 174136.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
Aug 1744³39.9DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Giovanni Vico Torrellas:
Archbishop Vincenzo Giovanni Vico Torrellas (born ) Archbishop of Oristano

  • a priest for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 80, and Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013