Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis de Vervins, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1547BornCarpentras
17 Jul 160052.9AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
8 Dec 160053.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Narbonne, France
8 Feb 162880.5DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Vervins:
Archbishop Louis de Vervins O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 3 Feb 2015