Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Verospi

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571Born
162756.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
30 Aug 162756.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Oct 162756.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
5 Sep 163362.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
27 Jan 163968.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Verospi
Fabrizio Cardinal Verospi (born 1571, died ) Prefect of Council

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018