Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Verdon

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663²Born
17 Aug 167613.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 170946.4SelectedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
14 Sep 170946.7ConfirmedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
Mar 1711³48.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
Oct 1728²65.7DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Verdon
Bishop John Verdon (born 1663, died Oct 1728) Bishop of Ferns

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,822
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 200
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Aug 2020

Quantcast