Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Ventriglia

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1650Born
30 Dec 167424.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 170352.6AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
1708¹57.4DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Ventriglia
Bishop Nicolaus Ventriglia (born , died 1708) Bishop of Acerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurti

  • a priest for 33.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 66
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018