Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Ventorelli

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1426AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
21 Apr 1426Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
18 Dec 1442DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Ventorelli:
Bishop Filippo Ventorelli (died ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 86
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,705
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013