Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Magino Ventallol, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Carystus

Titular See: (never consecrated)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1647Born
3 Dec 171871.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
3 Dec 171871.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
3 Jan 173284.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

MicroData Summary for Magino Ventallol
Father Magino Ventallol O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Death PlaceCanton

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 146
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast