Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacopo Antonio Cardinal Venier

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1422²BornRecanati
9 Jan 146240.0AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
16 Sep 146442.7AppointedBishop of León, Spain
22 Dec 146543.9Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
6 Oct 146947.7AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
7 May 147351.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 147351.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
3 Dec 147654.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
3 Aug 147957.5DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacopo Antonio Venier:
Giacopo Antonio Cardinal Venier (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 174, and Page 244
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,475
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 133
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 308, Number 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015