Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Johannes (Adriaan Petrus) Van Engelen, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1897BornHedikhuizen, Netherlands
17 Oct 191518.2ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
30 Sep 192326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
25 Jul 195759.9AppointedAbbot of Order of Cistercians
17 Nov 197679.2DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

MicroData Summary for Johannes (Adriaan Petrus) Van Engelen:
Abbot Johannes (Adriaan Petrus) Van Engelen O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

  • a priest for 53.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013