Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cayetano Velozo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note/Previous Titular See: (a Nostra Domina de Populo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1729BornCaldas de Rainha, Portugal
16 Mar 175525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jan 180272.2SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
24 May 180272.5ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
Sep 1803³73.8DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Velozo:
Bishop Cayetano Velozo O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a priest for 48.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013