Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Velmecker, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jun 1481AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
2 Jul 1481Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
30 Jul 1505DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Velmecker:
Bishop Johannes Velmecker O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a bishop for 24.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013