Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal de Vecchi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1699BornSiena, Italy
24 Apr 177575.8Elevated to Cardinal
29 May 177575.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
24 Dec 177576.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Bernardino de Vecchi:
Cardinal Bernardino de Vecchi (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Apr 1775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013