Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Vecchiarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1667BornMontechio
16 May 169325.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 170941.7AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
24 Jan 1740³72.5DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Vecchiarelli:
Bishop Vincenzo Vecchiarelli (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 46.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 286
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015