Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaas van der Borcht

Deceased

Bishop of Middelburg, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503¹Born
10 Mar 156158.1AppointedBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands
26 Dec 156158.9Ordained BishopBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands
16 May 157370.3DiedBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaas van der Borcht (VIAF: 221237898)
Bishop Nicolaas van der Borcht (born 1503, died ) Bishop of Middelburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Rombaut, Malines, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018