Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jérôme Alexandre Vicentini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Naples

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1672BornArcis Antiquae
26 Dec 171240.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Dec 171240.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 171340.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
11 Jun 171340.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
5 Aug 172350.8DiedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Alexandre Vicentini
Archbishop Jérôme Alexandre Vicentini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Naples

  • a priest for 10.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 377
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 30
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016