Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Brunn

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Dec 1411SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
18 Mar 1412ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
20 Oct 1412Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
9 Jan 1440DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Brunn:
Bishop Johann von Brunn (died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 27.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 273
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 4, Page 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015