Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Georg von Braunschweig-Lüneburg

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

Bishop of Minden

Bishop of Verden


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1494Born
Oct 155459.8SelectedBishop of Minden, Germany
16 Dec 155561.0ConfirmedBishop of Minden, Germany
155863.1SelectedBishop of Verden, Germany
155863.1SelectedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
156166.1ConfirmedBishop of Verden, Germany
156166.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
14 Dec 156571.0DiedArchbishop-Elect of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (VIAF: 32811436)
Father Georg von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Bremen (and Hamberg)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolfenbüttel

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018