Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franz von Braunschweig-Lüneburg

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Minden, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1492Born
May 150816.3SelectedBishop of Minden, Germany
14 Jul 150816.5ConfirmedBishop of Minden, Germany
29 Nov 152937.9DiedBishop-Elect of Minden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz von Braunschweig-Lüneburg
Father Franz von Braunschweig-Lüneburg (born 1492, died ) Bishop-Elect of Minden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolfenbüttel

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018