Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João José Vaz Pereira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Carrhae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1770Born
20 Dec 179423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
27 Jun 182150.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
27 Jun 182150.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
4 May 183059.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João José Vaz Pereira
Bishop João José Vaz Pereira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFranco

  • a priest for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 135
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast