Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Vassé

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
4 Nov 157945.8AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
20 Feb 158046.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
Mar 1580³46.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
16 Mar 158349.2DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Vassé
Bishop Jean de Vassé (born 1534, died ) Bishop of Lisieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Le Mans
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018