Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Vassalli

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1463AppointedBishop of Potenza, Italy
17 Apr 1468AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
10 Mar 1474AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
1501²DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Vassalli
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Vassalli (died 1501) Bishop of Aversa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 218, and Page 257
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 100
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1463, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast