Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Airas Vásquez

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1244AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
6 Oct 1258DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Airas Vásquez
Bishop Airas Vásquez (died ) Bishop of Lisboa

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast