Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Ferdinand von Vasa (Wasa)

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1613BornWarszawa
3 May 162511.5SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
1 Oct 162511.9ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
9 Feb 164329.3AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
9 May 165541.5DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Karl Ferdinand von Vasa (Wasa):
Bishop Karl Ferdinand von Vasa (Wasa) (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 283, and Page 373
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015