Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Varo, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

Titular See: (died before appointment)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1627Born
8 Oct 164316.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Jan 168759.3DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Feb 168759.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco Varo
Father Francisco Varo O.P. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 251
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast