Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Albert Cardinal Vanhoye, S.J.

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1923 BornHazebrouck, France
25 Jul 195431.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Mar 200682.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200682.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani
28 May 200682.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani

MicroData Summary for Albert Vanhoye:
Cardinal Albert Vanhoye S.J. (born ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani

Please contact the Cardinal through the Cardinal Titular Church of Santa Maria della Mercede e Sant’Adriano a Villa Albani.

  • a priest for years
  • a cardinal for years

Source(s):
  • c: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013