Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Valperga

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1626³Born
9 Jun 166437.4AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
12 Feb 166942.1DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Valperga
Bishop Pompeo Valperga (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValperga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,664, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast