Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Lucio 聲gel Vallejo Balda

Secretary Emeritus of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

Priest of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1961 Born
1 Aug 198726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Astorga, Spain
21 Sep 201150.2AppointedSecretary of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
2016¹54.5ResignedSecretary of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucio 聲gel Vallejo Balda
Father Lucio 聲gel Vallejo Balda (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillamediana de Iregua, Spain

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017