Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo de Valladares, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1621AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
30 Aug 1627AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
23 May 1635DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joćo de Valladares:
Bishop Joćo de Valladares O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Porto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 245, and Page 286
  • bp: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015