Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germain Vaillant de Guelin

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1586AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
21 Dec 1586Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
15 Sep 1587DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Germain Vaillant de Guelin
Bishop Germain Vaillant de Guelin (died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,586, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast