Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernardo de Ustáriz, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Nueva Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1697³BornArandiga
19 Dec 176366.9AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
2 Aug 176467.5DiedBishop-Elect of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Ustáriz:
Father Bernardo de Ustáriz O.P. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Nueva Segovia

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015