Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Urríes Urríes, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1515²Born
9 Feb 157358.1AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
14 Aug 157358.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
28 Jun 158570.4DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Felipe Urríes Urríes
Bishop Felipe Urríes Urríes O.P. (born 1515, died ) Bishop of Barbastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaca, Diocese of Jaca
Ordained BishopDominican, Convent, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceBarbastro, Diocese of Barbastro

  • a bishop for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 83, Number 504
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 129
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018