Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Urgio

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Nov 1269AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
29 Dec 1269Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
12 Jan 1293DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Urgio
Bishop Pedro de Urgio (died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 509
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 297, Number 101
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,950

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 May 2019

Quantcast