Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Urbański

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1726³Born
12 Oct 174923.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Nov 174923.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 176943.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
11 Sep 176943.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
28 Mar 177043.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antonius Urbański
Bishop Antonius Urbański (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanok

  • a priest for 20.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1769, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018