Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Ujlaky

Deceased

Bishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485Born
2 Jun 155065.4AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
3 Aug 155469.5AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
1 Feb 155570.0DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Ujlaky
Bishop Ferenc Ujlaky (born 1485, died ) Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRomania

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 98, and Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018